## Instant Multiplication

math,help,help wanted,help on homework,homework help math,math homework help,science homework help,free homework help,kids homework help,free online homework help,homework help,free math help,math worksheets,online math tutor,free online math tutors,math problems,free math worksheets,math tutors,math problem solving,free elementary math worksheets,math homework answers,homework helper math,online math calculator,math practice test,cool math,math homework sheets

It’s very easy once you know the secret.

Consider the problem: 32 x 11

To solve this problem,
simply add the digits, 3 + 2 = 5,
put the 5 between the 3 and the 2, and there is your answer:

352

What could be easier? Now you try:
53 x 11
583

One more. Without looking at the answer or writing anything
down, what is
81 x 11?
Did you get 891?

Congratulations!
Now before you get too excited, I have shown you only half
of what you need to know.

Suppose the problem is 85 x 11

Although 8 + 5 = 13, the answer is NOT 8135 !

See how to resolve this

Here is another example. Try 57 x 11.

Okay, now it’s your turn. As fast as you can, what is 77 x 11?

If you got the answer 847, then give yourself a pat on the
back. (LoL) You are on your way to becoming a mathematician.

Now, I know from experience that if you tell a friend or
by eleven, it won’t be long before they ask you to do 99 x 11.

Okay, take a moment to practice your new skill a few times,
then start showing off. You will be amazed at the reaction you
get. (Whether or not you decide to reveal the secret is up to you!)

Can we use this method for multiplying three-digit numbers
(or larger) by eleven?

Absolutely. For instance, take the problem 314 x 11,

How to resolve this ?

But we’ll save larger problems
like this for later.
More practically, you are probably saying to yourself,

## Multiplication Example 1

Suppose the problem is 85 x 11

Although 8 + 5 = 13, the answer is NOT 8135 !

As before, the 3 goes in between the numbers, but the 1 needs
935

Think of the problem this way:
1
835
===
935

## Multiplication Example 2

Here is another example. Try 57 x 11.

Since 5 + 7 = 12, the answer is
1
527
===
627

## Multiplication Example 3

what is 99 x 11 ?

Let’s do this one now, so we are ready for it.
Since 9 + 9 = 18, the answer is:

1
989
====
1089

## Multiplication Example 4

consider the problem 314 x 11

answer still begins with 3 and ends with 4. Since 3 + 1 = 4, and
1 + 4 = 5, the answer is

3454

## Squaring and More

math,help,help wanted,help on homework,homework help math,math homework help,science homework help,free homework help,kids homework help,free online homework help,homework help,free math help,math worksheets,online math tutor,free online math tutors,math problems,free math worksheets,math tutors,math problem solving,free elementary math worksheets,math homework answers,homework helper math,online math calculator,math practice test,cool math,math homework sheets

Here is another quick trick.
As you probably know, the square of a number is a number multiplied by itself. For example, the square of 7 is 7 x 7 = 49.

Later, I will teach you a simple method that will enable you to easily calculate the square of any two-digit or three-digit (or higher) number. That method is especially simple when the number ends in 5,

so let’s do that trick now.
To square a two-digit number that ends in 5, you need to remember only two things.

1. The answer begins by multiplying the first digit by the next higher digit.
2. The answer ends in 25.

35
x35
3 x 4 = 12
5 x 5 =     25

ESET Smart Security 4 integrates powerful antimalware scanner, a two-way firewall and intelligent antispam to effectively eliminate all types of security threats...

These day invalid nod32 passwords provided by varies blogs. some times you may fed up with finding valid nod32 passwords..